NE LB873 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB880 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB880 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to cities of particular classes and villages, correct and include references as prescribed, eliminate obsolete provisions and repeal definitions, provide for interlocal nuisance agreements, to determine population thresholds, redefine certain economic development programs, authorize creation of additional land banks, change comprehensive plans for an early childhood element, authorize short-term rentals, and change provisions relating to the official state slogan and symbol
Title
Change provisions relating to cities of particular classes and villages, correct and include references as prescribed, eliminate obsolete provisions and repeal definitions, provide for interlocal nuisance agreements, to determine population thresholds, redefine certain economic development programs, authorize creation of additional land banks, change comprehensive plans for an early childhood element, authorize short-term rentals, and change provisions relating to the official state slogan and symbol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 26-15-8 (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB880 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB854 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB768 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB765 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB756 amended into LB873 by AM2519 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB748 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB735 amended into LB873 by AM2065 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 26-15-8 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Groene FA166 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Groene FA166 filed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST60 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Erdman FA159 lost |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Erdman FA159 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Wayne AM2827 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER170 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Wayne AM2827 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER170 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER170 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Geist FA122 lost |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Geist FA122 pending |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Geist FA122 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Larson MO275 withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Larson MO275 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2065 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2520 lost |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2519 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2520 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2519 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2259 divided |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers AM2370 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2065 pending |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2259 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers AM2370 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2065 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2065 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Urban Affairs priority bill |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |