NE LB86 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to opening bids

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to opening bids

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 12, 2017
2017-05-09LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 08, 2017
2017-05-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2017-05-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER71 adopted
2017-04-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER71 filed
2017-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER71
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-20LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM33 adopted
2017-02-06LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM33 filed
2017-02-06LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM33
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback