NE LB855 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1329 by AM2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1329 by AM2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit school districts from taking certain actions relating to outstanding debts on a school lunch or breakfast account
Title
Prohibit school districts from taking certain actions relating to outstanding debts on a school lunch or breakfast account
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1329 by AM2831 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2024 |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |