NE LB854 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB854 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB854 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions under the Public Funds Deposit Security Act relating to secured deposits and pooled collateral
Title
Change provisions under the Public Funds Deposit Security Act relating to secured deposits and pooled collateral
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB854 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2154 filed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2154 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41038 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB854.pdf |