NE LB850 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize placement of a monument to the First Regiment Nebraska Volunteer Infantry at Fort Donelson National Battlefield
Title
Authorize placement of a monument to the First Regiment Nebraska Volunteer Infantry at Fort Donelson National Battlefield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2226 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2226 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Communication |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST64 |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER194 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER194 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER194 |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2226 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2226 filed |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2226 |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |