NE LB85 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a requirement for persons seeking appointive or elective office as prescribed and to provide a duty for the Nebraska Accountability and Disclosure Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a requirement for persons seeking appointive or elective office as prescribed and to provide a duty for the Nebraska Accountability and Disclosure Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 29, 2017
2017-03-23LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 23, 2017
2017-03-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-03-23LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-03-15LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-03-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-03-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER11 adopted
2017-02-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER11 filed
2017-02-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER11
2017-02-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-02-23LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM30 adopted
2017-01-23LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM30 filed
2017-01-23LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM30
2017-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureChambers name added
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback