NE LB849 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB849 amended into LB848 by AM2723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB849 amended into LB848 by AM2723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change eligibility requirements under the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Title
Change eligibility requirements under the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB849 amended into LB848 by AM2723 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2149 filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2149 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41231 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB849.pdf |