NE LB84 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Build Nebraska Act and provide for distribution of sales and use tax revenue for road construction
Title
Adopt the Build Nebraska Act and provide for distribution of sales and use tax revenue for road construction
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Utter explanation of vote | |
2011-05-11 | Presented to Governor on May 11, 2011 | |
2011-05-11 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-11 | Passed on Final Reading 33-10-6 | |
2011-05-11 | Nordquist AM1273 withdrawn | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Final Reading with ST26 | |
2011-04-20 | Nordquist AM1273 filed | |
2011-04-20 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Fischer AM1216 adopted | |
2011-04-20 | Nordquist AM1268 lost | |
2011-04-20 | Fischer MO34 prevailed | |
2011-04-20 | Fischer MO34 Invoke cloture filed | |
2011-04-20 | Nordquist AM1268 filed | |
2011-04-20 | Conrad MO32 failed | |
2011-04-19 | Conrad MO32 pending | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to overrule Chair failed | |
2011-04-19 | Chair ruled Mello AM1230 is not germane to Fischer AM1216 | |
2011-04-19 | Mello AM1231 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Council AM1248 lost | |
2011-04-19 | Council AM1248 filed | |
2011-04-19 | Mello AM1229 lost | |
2011-04-19 | Louden AM1228 lost | |
2011-04-19 | Conrad AM1236 lost | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer AM1216 pending | |
2011-04-19 | Louden AM1093 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer AM1025 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Louden AM999 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Council AM968 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Mello AM980 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer FA11 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Louden AM975 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Mello AM974 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Utter AM958 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Conrad AM962 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer AM940 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer AM916 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Flood FA8 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Fischer AM827 withdrawn | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to overrule Chair failed | |
2011-04-19 | Chair ruling on order of consideration of amendments and motions | |
2011-04-19 | Point of order | |
2011-04-19 | Conrad MO32 Bracket until January 5, 2012 filed | |
2011-04-19 | Announcement of order of amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Conrad AM1236 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Mello AM1231 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Mello AM1230 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Mello AM1229 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Louden AM1228 filed | |
2011-04-14 | Fischer AM1216 filed | |
2011-04-12 | Speaker Major Proposal | |
2011-04-05 | Louden AM1093 filed | |
2011-03-29 | Fischer AM1025 filed | |
2011-03-28 | Louden AM999 filed | |
2011-03-28 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-03-25 | Council AM968 filed | |
2011-03-25 | Mello AM980 filed | |
2011-03-25 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-03-25 | Revenue AM385 adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Nordquist MO24 failed | |
2011-03-25 | Fischer MO25 prevailed | |
2011-03-25 | Fischer MO25 Invoke cloture filed | |
2011-03-24 | Fischer FA11 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Nordquist MO24 pending | |
2011-03-24 | Nordquist MO24 Recommit to Revenue committee filed | |
2011-03-24 | Louden AM975 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Mello AM974 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO23 failed | |
2011-03-24 | Utter AM958 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad AM962 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO23 pending | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO23 pending | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO23 Reconsider the vote on the bracket motion filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO22 failed | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO22 pending | |
2011-03-24 | Conrad MO22 Bracket until January 4, 2012 filed | |
2011-03-24 | Revenue AM385 pending | |
2011-03-23 | Fischer AM940 filed | |
2011-03-23 | Fischer AM916 filed | |
2011-03-22 | Flood FA8 filed | |
2011-03-16 | Fischer AM827 filed | |
2011-02-24 | Fischer priority bill | |
2011-02-17 | Revenue AM385 filed | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on General File with AM385 | |
2011-02-11 | Pahls name added | |
2011-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2011 | |
2011-01-12 | Pankonin name added | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |