NE LB831 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for caregiver diversion programs and conditional release of pregnant and postpartum inmates
Title
Provide for caregiver diversion programs and conditional release of pregnant and postpartum inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |