NE LB83 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB928 amended into LB83 by AM2191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB928 amended into LB83 by AM2191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the definition of employer relating to wage discrimination on the basis of sex
Title
Change the definition of employer relating to wage discrimination on the basis of sex
Sponsors
Sen. Tanya Cook [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 32-11-6 (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB928 amended into LB83 by AM2191 |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016 |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Kolowski explanation of vote |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 32-11-6 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Larson AM2672 withdrawn |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Larson AM2672 filed |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER176 adopted |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER176 filed |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER176 |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Brasch AM2383 withdrawn |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Brasch AM2383 filed |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Kintner FA90 withdrawn |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2191 adopted |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Kintner FA90 filed |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2191 pending |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2191 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2191 |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Cook priority bill |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |