NE LB821 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to assessments by the Nebraska Power Review Board
Title
Change provisions relating to assessments by the Nebraska Power Review Board
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Hughes MO195 prevailed |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Hughes MO195 Withdraw bill filed |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34159 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB821.pdf |