NE LB821 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB957 amended into LB821 by AM2138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB957 amended into LB821 by AM2138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Nebraska Children's Commission and adopt the Office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare Act
Title
Create the Nebraska Children's Commission and adopt the Office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB957 amended into LB821 by AM2138 | |
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB837 amended into LB821 by AM2138 | |
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 | |
2012-04-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Final Reading Second | |
2012-03-30 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment | |
2012-03-30 | Campbell AM2677 adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Returned to Select File for specific amendment | |
2012-03-29 | Campbell AM2677 filed | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Final Reading with ST67 | |
2012-03-07 | Pirsch name added | |
2012-03-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2276 withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2323 withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2336 adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2336 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2334 adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Lathrop AM2334 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Campbell AM2304 adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Enrollment and Review ER196 adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Lathrop AM2276 filed | |
2012-03-06 | Lathrop AM2323 filed | |
2012-03-06 | Campbell AM2304 filed | |
2012-03-05 | Enrollment and Review ER196 filed | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Select File with ER196 | |
2012-02-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-28 | Health and Human Services AM2138 adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Health and Human Services AM2138 pending | |
2012-02-24 | Health and Human Services AM2138 filed | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on General File with AM2138 | |
2012-02-16 | Health and Human Services priority bill | |
2012-01-24 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2012 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Date of introduction |