NE LB820 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a method of selecting winners for certain lotteries and raffles
Title
Provide a method of selecting winners for certain lotteries and raffles
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | General Affairs AM1987 filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1987 |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016 |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28704 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB820.pdf |