NE LB82 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Motor Vehicles to include certain traffic stop safety information in the Nebraska Driver's Manual
Title
Require the Department of Motor Vehicles to include certain traffic stop safety information in the Nebraska Driver's Manual
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31461 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB82.pdf |