NE LB813 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations for apprenticeships and provide powers for the Department of Labor
Title
State intent regarding appropriations for apprenticeships and provide powers for the Department of Labor
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Bolz AM2147 filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40855 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB813.pdf |