NE LB810 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Medical Ethics and Diversity Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Medical Ethics and Diversity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-05-16LegislatureHunt AM1764 filed
2023-05-16LegislatureHunt AM1755 filed
2023-05-16LegislatureHunt AM1766 filed
2023-05-16LegislatureHunt AM1765 filed
2023-05-16LegislatureHunt AM1763 filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO883 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO880 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO884 Recommit to Health and Human Services Committee filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO882 Recommit to Health and Human Services Committee filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO879 Recommit to Health and Human Services Committee filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO881 Indefinitely postpone filed
2023-03-31LegislatureConrad MO878 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed
2023-03-13LegislatureMurman priority bill
2023-02-24LegislatureFredrickson AM518 filed
2023-02-07LegislatureMurman AM249 filed
2023-02-07LegislatureMurman AM250 filed
2023-02-07LegislatureMurman AM248 filed
2023-02-07LegislatureMurman AM247 filed
2023-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2023-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=50633
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB810.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM247.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM248.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM250.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM249.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM518.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO878.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO879.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO880.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO881.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO882.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO883.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO884.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1763.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1765.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1766.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1755.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1764.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB810.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB810_20230209-071754.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback