NE LB810 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of State Tort Claims Act relating to certain claims arising out of misrepresentation or deceit by the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Change provisions of State Tort Claims Act relating to certain claims arising out of misrepresentation or deceit by the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Harr MO169 prevailed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Harr MO169 Withdraw bill filed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 (cancel) |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34035 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB810.pdf |