NE LB810 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB810 amended into LB957 by AM2217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB810 amended into LB957 by AM2217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the Nebraska Youth Conservation Program and transfer funds to the Cowboy Trail Fund
Title
Eliminate the Nebraska Youth Conservation Program and transfer funds to the Cowboy Trail Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB810 amended into LB957 by AM2217 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016 |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28682 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB810.pdf |