NE LB807 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for replacement of statues in the United States Capitol
Title
Provide for replacement of statues in the United States Capitol
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-1-1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-1-1 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST65 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Harr AM2831 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER169 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Harr AM2831 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER169 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER169 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Brewer AM1863 withdrawn |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 adopted |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2392 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | State-Tribal Relations priority bill |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Brewer AM1863 filed |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |