NE LB800 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide and change strategic plan requirements for services for qualified persons with disabilities
Title
Provide and change strategic plan requirements for services for qualified persons with disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34431 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB800.pdf |