NE LB8 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to juvenile detention and probation and provide for graduated response sanctions and incentives
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to juvenile detention and probation and provide for graduated response sanctions and incentives
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Krist explanation of vote |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 23, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER9 adopted |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER9 filed |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER9 |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |