NE LB790 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB790 amended into LB853 by AM2397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB790 amended into LB853 by AM2397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require training for case managers as prescribed
Title
Require training for case managers as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB790 amended into LB853 by AM2397 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1667 filed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1667 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2014 |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21604 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB790.pdf |