NE LB79 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt and update references to federal transportation laws and allow for electronic images of certain registration certificates
Title
Adopt and update references to federal transportation laws and allow for electronic images of certain registration certificates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |