NE LB781 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change penalties for certain felonies committed by persons under nineteen years of age
Title
Change penalties for certain felonies committed by persons under nineteen years of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2018 (cancel) |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34180 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB781.pdf |