NE LB778 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Adopt the Umbilical Cord Blood Information Act
Title
Adopt the Umbilical Cord Blood Information Act
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-10 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2010 | |
2010-01-28 | Nordquist name added | |
2010-01-27 | Mello name added | |
2010-01-27 | McGill name added | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-08 | McCoy name added | |
2010-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9284 |