NE LB775 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change property tax provisions relating to motor vehicles
Title
Change property tax provisions relating to motor vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2016 |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |