NE LB774 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB774 amended into LB1160 by AM2003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB774 amended into LB1160 by AM2003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and add reporting requirements relating to child welfare
Title
Change and add reporting requirements relating to child welfare
Sponsors
Sen. Gwen Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/portions of LB774 amended into LB1160 by AM2003 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-10 | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2012 | |
2012-01-06 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15460 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB774.pdf |