NE LB773 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Exempt manure-spreading implements from titling and registration requirements and weight and load restrictions
Title
Exempt manure-spreading implements from titling and registration requirements and weight and load restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-08 | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9814 |