NE LB769 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB769 amended into LB814 by AM915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB769 amended into LB814 by AM915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize use of the Critical Infrastructure Facilities Cash Fund to develop a sewer system
Title
Authorize use of the Critical Infrastructure Facilities Cash Fund to develop a sewer system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB769 amended into LB814 by AM915 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO846 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO843 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO847 Recommit to Natural Resources Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO845 Recommit to Natural Resources Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO842 Recommit to Natural Resources Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO844 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO841 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM635 filed |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM635 |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Holdcroft priority bill |
2023-01-26 | Legislature | Holdcroft AM102 filed |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |