NE LB764 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB764 amended into LB905 by AM2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB764 amended into LB905 by AM2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for pediatric cancer research at the University of Nebraska Medical Center
Title
Appropriate funds for pediatric cancer research at the University of Nebraska Medical Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB764 amended into LB905 by AM2019 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-10 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21728 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB764.pdf |