NE LB763 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine terms relating to recreational liability to include private airstrips or runways and noncommercial aviation activities
Title
Redefine terms relating to recreational liability to include private airstrips or runways and noncommercial aviation activities
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |