NE LB756 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB756 amended into LB873 by AM2519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB756 amended into LB873 by AM2519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit ordinances prohibiting certain short-term rentals of residential property
Title
Prohibit ordinances prohibiting certain short-term rentals of residential property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB756 amended into LB873 by AM2519 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1642 filed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1642 |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33983 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB756.pdf |