NE LB752 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB811 by AM2877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB811 by AM2877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change certain assault provisions
Title
Change certain assault provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB811 by AM2877 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers AM2841 filed |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers FA207 lost |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers FA206 lost |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers FA205 lost |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO173 failed |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO173 Reconsider the vote taken on FA204 filed |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Chambers FA204 lost |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2274 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA204 pending |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA204 pending |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA227 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA226 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA225 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA224 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA223 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA222 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA221 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA220 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA219 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA218 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA217 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA216 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA215 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA214 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA213 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA212 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA211 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA210 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA209 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA208 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA207 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA206 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA205 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA204 filed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2014-02-12 | Legislature | Harr priority bill |
2014-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21743 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB752.pdf |