NE LB751 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that payment of certain expenses is not a condition precedent to certain approvals by the Director of Banking and Finance and change certain notice provisions
Title
Provide that payment of certain expenses is not a condition precedent to certain approvals by the Director of Banking and Finance and change certain notice provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 filed |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER155 |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1852 adopted |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1852 filed |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1852 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |