NE LB750 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1266 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1266 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to transportation
Title
Change provisions relating to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1966 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Erdman AM2294 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Albrecht AM2085 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Geist AM1967 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Friesen AM2067 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1966 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Erdman AM2294 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Albrecht AM2085 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Geist AM1967 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Legislature - Friesen AM2067 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1266 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1259 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1145 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1022 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB913 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB720 amended into LB750 by AM2085 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB714 amended into LB750 by AM1967 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER140 adopted |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER140 filed |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER140 |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1966 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Erdman AM2294 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Albrecht AM2085 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Geist AM1967 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Friesen AM2067 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Friesen AM2038 withdrawn |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Erdman AM2294 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Albrecht AM2085 filed |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Friesen AM2067 filed |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Geist AM1967 filed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2038 filed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1966 filed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1966 |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |