NE LB748 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB748 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to determination of municipality population thresholds and references to cities, villages, and governing bodies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to determination of municipality population thresholds and references to cities, villages, and governing bodies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB748 amended into LB873 by AM2065
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-17LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 16, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback