NE LB747 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB836 by AM2115
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB836 by AM2115
Summary
Permit killing mountain lions and other predatory animals
Title
Permit killing mountain lions and other predatory animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB836 by AM2115 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-03 | Natural Resources AM1931 filed | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on General File with AM1931 | |
2010-01-28 | McCoy name added | |
2010-01-20 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9681 |