NE LB741 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to transfer money and appropriate funds relating to housing
Title
State intent to transfer money and appropriate funds relating to housing
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB741 amended into LB814 by AM915 |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |