NE LB736 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
State intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-13 | Legislature | Ballard name added |
2023-03-22 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2023-03-21 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Dungan name added |
2023-02-09 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |