NE LB735 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a work group and establish the Nebraska Stewardship Program under the Nebraska Apiary Act
Title
Create a work group and establish the Nebraska Stewardship Program under the Nebraska Apiary Act
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Hunt AM1851 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Hunt AM1850 filed |
2023-02-13 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |