NE LB733 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide and change requirements for polling places
Title
Provide and change requirements for polling places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM738 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM738 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 14, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37625 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB733.pdf |