NE LB73 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to authorized uses for a County Visitors Improvement Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to authorized uses for a County Visitors Improvement Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB73 amended into LB775 by AM856 |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Rereferred to General Affairs Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |