NE LB727 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor on April 01, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor on April 01, 2010
Summary
Change compensation for retired judges serving temporary duty
Title
Change compensation for retired judges serving temporary duty
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor on April 01, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Presented to Governor on March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-03-26 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-03-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-22 | Speaker priority bill | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-27 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9703 |