NE LB721 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove a prohibition to regulate wireless telecommunications service by the Public Service Commission
Title
Remove a prohibition to regulate wireless telecommunications service by the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33888 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB721.pdf |