NE LB72 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Chambers MO2 Reconsider the vote to withdraw the bill filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Chambers MO2 Reconsider the vote to withdraw the bill filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for nonpartisan election of county officers
Title
Provide for nonpartisan election of county officers
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Chambers MO2 Reconsider the vote to withdraw the bill filed |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO1 prevailed |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO1 Withdraw bill filed |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37152 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB72.pdf |