NE LB719 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the authority of cities of the second class and villages to make loans to students
Title
Eliminate the authority of cities of the second class and villages to make loans to students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33904 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB719.pdf |