NE LB717 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change training requirements under the Quality Child Care Act
Title
Change training requirements under the Quality Child Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Krist MO303 withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Krist MO303 Suspend Rules to vote on advancement without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |