NE LB717 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor on April 09, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor on April 09, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Real Property Appraiser Act and professional qualifications
Title
Change provisions relating to the Real Property Appraiser Act and professional qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER191 adopted |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER191 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER191 |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Gloor AM2135 adopted |
2014-03-10 | Legislature | Gloor AM2135 filed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |