NE LB714 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate provisions relating to forged, altered, or raised checks under the Nebraska Banking Act
Title
Eliminate provisions relating to forged, altered, or raised checks under the Nebraska Banking Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |