NE LB713 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB956 by AM2216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB956 by AM2216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent relating to appropriations for the Access College Early Scholarship Program
Title
State intent relating to appropriations for the Access College Early Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB956 by AM2216 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2016 |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2016 (cancel) |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28549 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB713.pdf |